judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN (STEVE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42051
Short Caption:COLEMAN (STEVE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39776 , 43262 , 45157 , 49556 , 54078 , 69483 , 69570 , 69570-COA , 69720
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C181527Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15556
10/02/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 18, 2003. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 03-16399
10/06/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16577
01/09/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/18/03. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 04-00583
01/20/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-01115
01/20/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-01116
01/26/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. Original Copy. 04-01115
02/23/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-03374
02/23/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 04-03375
03/25/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-05627
03/25/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Docket No. 42051 is an appeal from an order of the district court denying a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Appellant is represented by counsel in that appeal. Docket No. 43262 is a proper person petition for extraordinary relief, which appellant filed in this court on May 7, 2004. Appellant has now filed a proper person motion to consolidate the two matters and for an evidentiary hearing. No good cause having been shown, the proper person motion is hereby denied. This court cautions appellant to proceed hereafter in Docket No. 42051 by and through his counsel of record. Nos. 42051/43262 - cases are not consolidated. 04-09367
06/04/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "We ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn 15-[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying Coleman's appeal deprivation claim shall be docketed as a new matter. We have received Coleman's May 24, 2004 motion submitted in proper person. Because Coleman is represented by counsel, we decline to grant him permission to proceed in proper person in this matter. SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-10246
06/29/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-10398
06/29/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2004. 04-10398