judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SELINGER VS. MASON

Case Information: 34801
Short Caption:SELINGER VS. MASONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A312654Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Foley & Jones-check no. 10083.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08526
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 17, 1999. 99-10491
12/21/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12987
12/21/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-12989
12/21/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-12990
01/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-00742
01/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.