judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALONZO LEVITT PINDER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1006
Short Caption:ALONZO LEVITT PINDER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1038-10Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlonzo Levitt Pinder YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond Rigat, Esquire
09/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (130pgs/Tape) 8/10/10 proc.
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8pgs/Tape) 8/11/10 proc. w/CD included
09/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/3/10)
10/12/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
10/12/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
11/12/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
02/09/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY *****MORE*****
02/09/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (jl)
02/18/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED