judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONROE (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42050
Short Caption:MONROE (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48204
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184874Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15554
10/28/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 3, 2003. 03-18012
11/06/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. 03-18575
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 6, 2003. Counsel has not filed a copy of a rough draft transcript request form in this court as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3). If counsel for appellant filed a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel for appellant is directed to file 2 copies of that rough draft transcript request form and proof of served in this court within 5 days of this order. If counsel for appellant did not file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel is ordered to file such a request form within 5 days of this order, and file 2 copies of the transcript request form and proof of service in this court within 10 days of this order. Appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts in this appeal in which to file the fast track statement and appendix. 03-19757
01/13/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file 2 copies of the rough draft transcript request form in this court, or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-00737
03/05/2004Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Mr. Kang has again failed to respond to this court's order. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Accordingly, Kang shall personally pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of his court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library within 20 days of the date of this order. Further, Kang have 5 days to file 2 copies of the rough draft transcript request form in this court, or show cause why Kang should no be sanctioned further. 04-04189
03/08/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/11/03, 6/12/03, 6/13/03. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 04-04418
03/15/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/10/03 through 6/13/03. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. Filed in district court on: 5/5/04. 04-04916
04/28/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Check no. 500 in the amount of $500.00 payable to the Supreme Court Law Library. 04-07785
05/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Dowon S. Kang shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-08425
06/25/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 6, 2004, this court ordered Kang to file the fast track statement in 10 days or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. Kang has not responded. Kang shall file the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order, or this court will order Kang to appear personally before a single justice of this court and show cause why he should not be held in contempt and sanctioned further, including referral to the State Bar. 04-11691
07/08/2004Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 04-12493
07/08/2004AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. 04-12494
07/12/2004MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. To-wit: 19 pages. 04-12665
07/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 12, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the 19-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on July 12, 2004. 04-12930
07/15/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-12493
07/15/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-12494
07/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Fast Track Statement. 04-13460
08/06/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 15 Page Fast Track Response. Granted: 15 pages. 04-14297
08/06/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-14299
02/28/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn22[Because Monroe is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. See NRAP 46(b). Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return to Monroe unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court in this matter.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-03886
02/28/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Steven Lamont Monroe. Returned unfiled, "Proper Person Letter dated May 26, 2004 and received on June 11, 2004."
03/25/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04565
03/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2005. 05-04565