judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIBBS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45971
Short Caption:GIBBS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49160
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C208733Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18712
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 05-19149
10/13/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 04/05/05, 04/07/05, 04/08/05, 05/03/05, 05/31/05, 06/06/05, 06/07/05, and 08/19/05. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 05-20284
11/02/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 7, 2005. 05-21571
11/09/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-22105
11/09/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-22107
12/02/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 12 pages. 05-23645
12/02/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23646
07/14/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7-[the clerk of this court shall return to Gibbs unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-14622
07/14/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Request of Appellant to be Allowed to Supplement a Claim to his Fast Track Appeal; and Supplemental Claim. (per 07/14/06 order.)
08/04/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-16195
08/07/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-16362
08/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the petition for rehearing received on August 10, 2006. fn1[A motion identical to the August 4 motion was filed on August 7. As it is duplicative, this court will take no action with respect to the August 7 motion.] 06-17061
08/16/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. 06-16642
09/12/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c).SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-18819
10/10/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20625
10/10/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2006. 06-20625