judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLEN (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45970
Short Caption:ALLEN (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54068
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195682Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/16/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18711
09/30/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/23/03, 09/07/04, 06/21/05, 06/27/05 (2), 06/28/05, 06/29/05, 06/30/05, 07/01/05, and 08/17/05. To Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. 05-19460
09/30/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19461
12/27/2005Order/Procedural Order. Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Mr. D'Amato and Ms. Schorn shall within the same time period, file a motion for extension of time or if the transcripts cannot be produced, notify this court in writing, of this fact. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 05-25133
01/20/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 17, 2006. 06-01491
01/30/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Tuesday, September 7, 2004 at 9:00 a.m.; Monday, June 27, 2005 at 9:00 a.m.; Monday, June 27, 2005 at 1:30 p.m.; Tuesday, June 28, 2005 at 1:30 p.m.; Thursday, June 30, 2005 at 1:30 p.m.; Wednesday, June 29, 2005 at 1:30 p.m.; Friday, July 1, 2005 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 06-02226
02/08/2006MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Appear in Proper Person and Withdrawal of Public Defender due to Conflict.clerk7 04/18/06 Order-fn2: filed motion.jcr 06-02849
02/16/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (second request-30 days requested) 06-03534
02/27/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/23/03 and 08/17/05. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 06-04256
02/27/2006MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Brief and for Order Directing Counsel to Provide.clerk7 04/18/06 Order-fn2: filed motion.jcr 06-04449
04/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Court reporter Joseph D'Amato shall have 20 days order to file the requested transcript for June 21, 2005. If more time is needed, Mr. D'Amato shall within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension or if the requested transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We direct the clerk to file the proper person documents received on February 8, 2006, February 17, 2006, and February 27, 2006. We decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted to this court.] Appellant requests this court to withdraw his appellate counsel and allow him to proceed in proper person. Appellant has failed to establish good cause to warrant the removal of his counsel. We deny any and all relief requested in appellant's proper person documents. 06-08079
04/18/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Appear in Proper Person and Withdrawal of Public Defender due to Conflict. 06-02849
04/18/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Supplement Supporting Motion to Withdraw Public Defender and Allow Pro Se Representation due to Conflict on 1st Degree Murder Appeal. 06-03667
04/18/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Brief and for Order Directing Counsel to Provide. 06-04449
04/26/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 21, 2005. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 06-08788
05/26/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (20 days requested) 06-11204
07/10/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Alternatively, within the same time period, appellant's counsel shall inform this court if he has still not received all of the requested transcripts. 06-14114
08/10/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-16676
08/10/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-16677
09/12/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-18835
10/25/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
11/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-23509
11/16/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/09/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-00625
02/06/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-02324
02/06/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/13/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 8, 2007. 07-02324