Case: 09-18-00392-CV
09-18-00392-CV
10/10/2018
Interlocutory
Oxbow Calcining LLC
Port Arthur Steam Energy, LP
No
Ninth Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/19/2018 | Supplemental brief filed | Appellee |
| ||||
11/07/2018 | Supplemental brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
10/29/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
10/24/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2019 | Case stored | | |||||||
02/21/2019 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
01/09/2019 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
01/08/2019 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||||
01/02/2019 | Response filed |
| |||||||
12/21/2018 | Motion filed | | |||||||
12/13/2018 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
12/13/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered |
| ||||||
12/04/2018 | Response filed |
| |||||||
11/27/2018 | Motion for emergency relief filed | | |||||||
11/19/2018 | Supplemental brief filed |
| |||||||
11/19/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
11/07/2018 | Supplemental brief filed |
| |||||||
10/31/2018 | Motion for leave disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/30/2018 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||||
10/30/2018 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
10/29/2018 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/29/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
10/26/2018 | Motion for leave filed |
| |||||||
10/24/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
10/24/2018 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
10/19/2018 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
10/18/2018 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
10/16/2018 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
10/16/2018 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/16/2018 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
10/15/2018 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
10/10/2018 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | Accelerated |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/21/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Oxbow Calcining LLC | Appellant | Toby Nash Cornelius M. Sweers Amy Pharr Hefley Kevin Thomas Jacobs Guy Goodson Michael S. Goldberg Kate K. Leverett |
Port Arthur Steam Energy LP | Appellee | Zona Jones James A. Dunn S. Loyd Neal III Brian D. Sutton |
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Donald Floyd
E-201,894
Holly Giffin