judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENDERSON (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31718
Short Caption:HENDERSON (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35449 , 42839
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130159Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/17/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/26/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/26/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits.
02/11/1998Other Other. Received certified copy of district court Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order.
06/17/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3.
06/17/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/20/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief (original and 1 copy).
05/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1-We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. NNP99B - CY/DA/ML
06/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
08/15/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. 00-14247