judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FREDERIC ERWIN WATTS V. M. CRUZ

Case Information: 10-SP-0939
Short Caption:FREDERIC ERWIN WATTS V. M. CRUZClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC1024-09Filed Date:07/20/2010

Opening Event Date:07/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrederic Erwin Watts YPro SeN
AppelleeM. Cruz N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/20/2010FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/20/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
08/23/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
08/23/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
09/13/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
09/23/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that appellant is seeking MANDAMUS RELIEF, that relief IS DENIED. (FITHNW) (rm)
09/23/2010DISMISSED
10/15/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived