Case: 03-11-00324-CV
03-11-00324-CV
05/06/2011
Miscellaneous civil
1995 Prowler Travel Trailer, et al.
The State of Texas
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/28/2011 | Document returned | | |||||
11/17/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
08/19/2011 | Document returned | | |||||
08/09/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution |
| ||||
08/08/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
06/27/2011 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record | | |||||
06/13/2011 | Response filed | | |||||
06/10/2011 | Telephone call received | | |||||
06/06/2011 | Response filed | | |||||
06/01/2011 | Notice of late record | | |||||
05/06/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Appellee | The Honorable Kerry M. Spears The Honorable Lisa C. McMinn |
Gardiner, Stephen | Appellant | Mr. Stephen Gardiner |
Trial Court Information
20th District Court
Milam
Honorable Ed Magre
34,180