judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIABLO INDUSTRIES VS. WILSON

Case Information: 31714
Short Caption:DIABLO INDUSTRIES VS. WILSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 95CV0312Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/29/1998 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins - check no 20522.
01/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
01/23/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. (Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins)
01/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/30/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
02/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/11/1998Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement.
03/30/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From settlement judge regarding continuance of settlement conference.
02/16/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From Settlement Judge Worrell re: status of pending cases. Nos. 31714, 32125, 32734, 32740, 32756, 32944, 32975, 32991, 32992.
04/20/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From Settlement Judge Worrell re: status of pending cases. Nos. 31714, 32125, 32734, 32740, 32756, 32944, 32975, 32991, 32992.
11/22/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From Settlement Judge Carolyn Worrell. Settlement conference is continued until the last week of January, 2000.
01/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
02/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The Settlement Judge has filed a report that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31 (a) (1).
04/21/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/21/00.)
04/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix to opening brief.
05/22/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered.)
06/13/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/13/00.)
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-15035
08/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel: NNP01A-MS/DA/RR.
04/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-06804
04/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Association of Counsel. Richard G. Hill has associated as counsel in this case of behalf of respondent Deborah Wilson with Levery & Associates. 01-06975
04/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Agreement to Dismiss Appeal). 01-06978
04/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. On April 20, 2001, the parties filed an agreement to dismiss this appeal. The parties' agreement is approved, and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-07121
04/27/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.