judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON

Case Heading (S-07-0133)
Case Number:S-07-0133Case Docketed On:06/22/2007
Linked To: S-07-0132 , S-07-0162
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON
Full Title:CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCC BuildersKenneth S. Cohen
Heather Noble
AppelleeWayne GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett
AppelleePamela GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 34
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/10/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellees'BriefAppelleeFinal
11/01/2007Motion - Other - Motion requesting leave of court to file motion under Rule 60(a) to correction judgmentMotionOtherFinal
11/05/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2007Motion - Other - appellant's motion regarding late served brief (requesting sanctions).MotionOtherFinal
11/16/2007Affidavit - Other - affidavit of Heather Noble regarding motion on late served briefAffidavitOtherFinal
11/19/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Appellees' response to appellant's motion for leave of court to file motion to correct judgment and request for leave to present to present argument to trial court.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/20/2007Order - Denying motion requesting leave to file motion under rule 60(a).OrderDenyFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for CC Builders Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/28/2007Response/Objection - Motion (appellant's) regarding late served briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/28/2007Affidavit - Other Lawrence B. HartnettAffidavitOtherFinal
12/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes (two boxes total). Volumes I-V, original papers; Volume VI, exhibits; Volume VII, attachments to pleadings; Volume VIII, (one box containing) transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/04/2007Order - Other. Order on motion regarding late-served brief.OrderOtherFinal
12/10/2007Motion - Other. Renewed motion pursuant to rule 60(a) to correct judgment.MotionOtherFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lawrence B. Hartnett for appellants Garrison and Kenneth S. Cohen for appellees CC Builders, Inc. and Clint Cook) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/18/2007Order - Granting leave of the district court to correct clerical mistakeOrderGrantFinal
01/22/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Faxed copy of Order amending judgment sum to correct clerical mistake. Filed 1/16/08 in the Ninth Judicial District Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
03/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Record signed for 4/17/08 by E. Johnson (2 cards, 2 boxes)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal