judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT BRANDON, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0974
Short Caption:ROBERT BRANDON, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-4499-10Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Brandon, Jr.Y
Everald F. ThompsonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL (EMERGENCY)
08/13/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
08/17/2010TMC - motion for summary reversal - motion for summary affirmance - NOA
08/19/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that EVERALD THOMPSON ESQUIRE is HEREBY APPOINTED to represent appellant NPT TO AUGUST 9, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE******
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (KRFIKG) (jl)
08/26/2010RECEIVED - record
08/26/2010RECEIVED - record index
08/27/2010RECEIVED - SR#1 (21pgs/Tape) 3/19/10 proc.
08/27/2010RECEIVED - SR#2 (7pgs/Tape) 7/2/10 proc. w/CD included
09/10/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived