Case: WR-89,082-01
WR-89,082-01
10/12/2018
11.07 HC
VALADEZ, ALVIN JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/2019 | ORDER ISSUED | HC relief denied with written order/opinion |
| ||||
02/19/2019 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
02/13/2019 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD |
| |||||
02/13/2019 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
12/19/2018 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
10/12/2018 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
10/12/2018 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/05/2019 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
VALADEZ, Jr., ALVIN | Applicant | John C. Moncure |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
2nd 25th District Court
Guadalupe
13-1568-CR-C-A