judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VOLK VS. STATE, ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Information: 34783
Short Caption:VOLK VS. STATE, ATTORNEY GENERALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364343Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/06/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rodney Volk-Ensign Federal Credit Union -check no. 4718013797.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08408
09/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08971
10/06/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. 99-09631
10/06/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/13/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. RETURNED Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 (originals), with letter to Clark County Clerk: "Pursuant to your telephone request, we are returning the record on appeal in thie above entitled matter. . . . Please return the record on appeal to this court within 10 days." 99-09895
10/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered the proper person documents received from appellants]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10193
11/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
11/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Filing fee on rehearing. Due Date: 10 days
11/16/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d).
11/16/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Rodney and Sylvia Volk--Bank of America cashier's check no. 000156501.
12/10/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellants]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 99-12424
12/28/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2. 99-13250
12/28/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/13/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 8, 2000. 99-13250