judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KRITINI DAVENPORT V. BORGER MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-0989
Short Caption:KRITINI DAVENPORT V. BORGER MANAGEMENT, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB9815-10Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKritini Davenport NPro SeN
AppelleeBorger Management Inc.N
Joshua M. GreenbergNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/20/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
09/20/2010TMC - OTSC
10/26/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for LACK OF STANDING since APPELLANT IS NOT AGGRIEVED by the order dismssing the complaint against her. See In re C.T. 724 A.2d 590 (DC 1999). (RDWATE) (rm)
10/26/2010DISMISSED
11/17/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived