judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PODESTA VS. GUSTEIN

Case Information: 34784
Short Caption:PODESTA VS. GUSTEINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34818 , 42534 , 54815
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D183564Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/20/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due. 10/8/99 Received from the district court: Order Waiving Fees and Costs filed in the district court September 10, 1999 (nos. 34784 & 34818).
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08409
09/07/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. (Attorney Ronda L. Mushkin).
09/17/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/15/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Matthew D. Manning with Substitution of Attorney filed in the district court on 10/08/99 attached. 99-10037
10/18/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to Matthew D. Manning in response to his 10/8/99 letter. 99-10107
12/13/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Withdrawal as Attorney of Record and Motion to Dismiss Pending Appeal as Moot. 99-12502
01/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion Without Prejudice. On December 13, 1999, counsel for respondent filed a motion to withdraw as attorney or record. We deny counsel's motion to withdraw without prejudice. Respondent has also moved to dismiss this appeal as moot. Respondent's arguments do not apply to this appeal, and so we deny the motion to dismiss. fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper perosn documents received from appellant]. 00-00221
03/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend this court's docket to reflect that respondent is now in proper person.] fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-04346
04/20/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 5. Mailed on 04/18/00. 00-06384
04/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed.' fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 00-12344
08/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 5 this day. 00-14209
08/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-14209