judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOTTA MITCHELL V. PAUL BROOM

Case Information: 10-CV-0990
Short Caption:CARLOTTA MITCHELL V. PAUL BROOMClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead:10-CV-0990Consolidated: 10-CV-1315
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB18207-10Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlotta Mitchell YPro SeN
AppelleePaul Broom N
Richard J. BiancoNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 10, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY- of execution of writ restitition
08/31/2010TMC - appellant's motion to stay - amended motion - opposition
08/31/2010RECEIVED - aplt's supp to emergency mot to stay the writ of restitution.
09/02/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to stay pending appeal
09/03/2010On consideration of appellant's motion and amended motion for stay and the opposition thereto, it isO that the motions for stay are denied. (FITHBE)
09/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of the denial of Motion for Stay.
09/09/2010ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION See Suitland Parkway Overlook Tenants Assoc v. Cooper, 616 A.2d 346 (DC 1992)... (FITHBE) (rm)
10/06/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 23, 2010, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, but it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
10/06/2010DISMISSED
10/14/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
10/14/2010TMC - motion to reinstate
10/21/2010RECEIVED-SR#1 (12-pgs/tape 8/4/10 proc.)w/cd
10/27/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY FILED IN APPEAL NO 10CV1315 IS DENIED...(absent a finding f fraud this court will not distrub consent judgments)...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
10/27/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL NO. 10CV990 IS GRANTED and the lodged transcript is filed. It is *****MORE*****
10/27/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that these APPEALS ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. It is *****MORE*****
10/27/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. (FITHBE) (rm)
10/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 pgs-TAPE-8/4/10) W/CD (Excerpt)(Corrected Transcript received from CCRD on 2/14/11 replacing previously submitted transcript) W/CD TJL
11/16/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 27, 2010, which directed appellant to submit a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 7 calendar days from the date of this order submit a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript. Failure to compy with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
11/30/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 16, 2010, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court, within 7 calendar days from the date of this order, but it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that these appeals are hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
11/30/2010DISMISSED
12/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
12/03/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/27/2010ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL (more)
12/27/2010F/ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record indexes and record copies for these apeals. It is F/ORDERED that the consolidated brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW)
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES both case
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX both cases
01/28/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED aplt
02/10/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 27, 2010, directing appellant to file the consolidated brief and the limited appendix within 40 days, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the consolidated brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
03/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 10, 2011, directing appellant to submit the consolidated brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that these appeals are hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
03/09/2011DISMISSED
04/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
04/08/2011RECEIVED - aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief
04/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate appeals, to which no opposition has been filed, and appellant's request for additional time to file her brief and limited appendix, and it appearing that these appeals were dismissed for appellant's failure to file her brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion to reinstate appeals is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's request for additional time is granted to the extent that appellant shall submit her consolidated brief and limited appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the denial of appellant's motion to reinsate appeals without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
06/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 29, 2011, which held appellant's motion to reinstate appeals in abeyance, and granted appellant's request for additional time to file her consolidated brief and limited appendix, and it appearing that appellant's consolidated brief and limited appendix were due to file filed with this court on May 31, 2011, and have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate appeals is hereby denied. (ETW) elp
11/14/2011FiledMandate