Case: D-2614
D-2614
07/06/1992
Second App Writ Error
DOLORES ORTEGA-CARTER AS COUNTY TREASURER FOR TRAVIS COUNTY TEXAS
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ADJUSTMENT COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/30/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | On behalf of American International Adjustment Company ("AIAC")Sequence #: 02 | |
11/19/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
08/03/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Dolores Ortega-CarterSequence #: 01 | |
07/22/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | of AIAC, reply to app of Dolores Ortega-CarterSequence #: 02 | |
07/21/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | "Petitioner's response to respondent's conditional application for writ of error", of Dolores Ortega-Carter et al.Sequence #: 01 | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
12/04/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Rehearing Overruled | | |
12/02/1992 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
11/30/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | On behalf of American International Adjustment Company ("AIAC")Sequence #: 02 | | |
11/19/1992 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
11/19/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
11/19/1992 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
11/04/1992 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | Resp's mo for damages | |
11/04/1992 | Conditional app writ err disposed | Dismissed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
11/04/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Application denied. Conditional app. dismissed. | W/Mo for damages overruled | |
11/04/1992 | Conditional app writ err disposed | Dismissed | | |
08/06/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/06/1992 | Notice from Counsel of a change in address | Warren D. Campell change of Law Firm to Donohoe, Jameson & Carroll | | |
08/03/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Dolores Ortega-CarterSequence #: 01 | | |
07/22/1992 | Miscellaneous Motion | "application for damages pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 182(b)" incorporated with reply of AIAC | | |
07/22/1992 | Reply to Response | of AIAC, reply to app of Dolores Ortega-CarterSequence #: 02 | | |
07/21/1992 | Reply to Response | "Petitioner's response to respondent's conditional application for writ of error", of Dolores Ortega-Carter et al.Sequence #: 01 | | |
07/06/1992 | Conditional application for writ of error filed | of American International Adjustment Company (COND APP)Sequence #: 02 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/04/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ORTEGA-CARTER, DOLORES | Petitioner | Mr. Ken Oden |
TRAVIS COUNTY TREASURER | Petitioner | Mr. John McCormick |
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ADJUSTM | Respondent | Mr. Warren D. Campbell |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-91-00781-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
834 SW2d 439, 04-14-92
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Barbara E. Rosenberg
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
89-10812-K