Case: 14-17-00823-CR
14-17-00823-CR
10/19/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Arvin Alexis Barboza
The State ofTexas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/29/2017 | Case stored | | |||||||
12/29/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/20/2017 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
11/27/2017 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||||
11/27/2017 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||||
11/20/2017 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
11/10/2017 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
11/10/2017 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
10/26/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
10/25/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/25/2017 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/19/2017 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
10/19/2017 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||||
10/19/2017 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
10/03/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/02/2017 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
08/03/2017 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/29/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/29/2017 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Barboza , Arvin Alexis | Criminal - Appellant | Arvin Alexis Barboza |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Kim K. Ogg Eric Kugler |
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 178th District Court
1473073
35 Yrs. TDCJ