judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Joel D. Mallory v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Successor by Merger to Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., and Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C.

Case: 01-12-00707-CV
01-12-00707-CV
07/30/2012
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Joel D. Mallory
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Successor by Merger to Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., and Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
05/02/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/22/2013Case stored
11/22/2013Mandate issued
11/18/2013Letter filed
09/27/2013Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtSC denies petition for review
08/06/2013Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
07/11/2013Motion to reconsider disposedDeny motion
06/28/2013Motion for rehearing due
06/18/2013Motion to reconsider filed
06/13/2013Memorandum opinion issuedDismiss appeal
06/13/2013Judgment Issued
06/13/2013Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/03/2013Appellees brief due
05/31/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/30/2013Response filed
05/28/2013Response due
05/17/2013Response requested by the court
05/13/2013Motion to dismiss filed
05/02/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/02/2013Appellants brief due
04/24/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
04/22/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/17/2013Supplemental clerks record filed
03/15/2013Appellants brief due
03/12/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
03/08/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/04/2013Appellants brief due
01/31/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/16/2013Appellants brief due
01/11/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/17/2012Submit on clerk's record alone - briefs due
12/14/2012Response filed
12/14/2012Response due
11/14/2012Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/2012Rehearing
11/08/2012Reply to response or motion filed
10/31/2012Certificate of service filed
10/29/2012Response filed
10/19/2012Order entered
10/12/2012Letter requesting information by the court
10/05/2012Motion for rehearing due
10/02/2012Motion for rehearing filed
09/20/2012Memorandum opinion issuedDismiss appeal
09/20/2012Judgment Issued
09/19/2012Submitted
09/14/2012Clerks record filed
08/27/2012Record due
08/20/2012Court fee due
08/20/2012Docketing statement due
08/14/2012Appearance of counsel
07/30/2012Notice of appeal received
07/30/2012Case began in court of appeals
07/29/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/30/2012Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
04/30/2012Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/2013Case StoredCase stored
11/22/2019RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. P. Morgan Chase BankAppelleeWilliam Lance L. Lewis
Marcie L. Schout
N.A. Chase Home Finance, L.L.C. AppelleeMarcie L. Schout
William Lance L. Lewis
Codilis & Stawiarski, P.C.AppelleeRobert L. Negrin
Mallory, Joel D.AppellantJoel D. Mallory Junior
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable Michael Engelhart
1064487
Carolyn Coronado