Case: WR-74,771-02
WR-74,771-02
09/07/2018
11.07 HC
FULLER, CHARLES RAY AKA CHARLES FULLER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/27/2018 | COURTESY COPY | | |||
11/02/2018 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |||
10/31/2018 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |||
09/26/2018 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear |
| ||
09/07/2018 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/26/2018 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FULLER, CHARLES RAY | Applicant |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
292nd District Court
Dallas
W15-51499-T (A)