judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KRITINI DAVENPORT V. 1613 HARVARD, LP

Case Information: 10-CV-0988
Short Caption:KRITINI DAVENPORT V. 1613 HARVARD, LPClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Lead:10-CV-0988Consolidated: 10-CV-1040
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5435-10Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKritini Davenport YPro SeN
Appellee1613 Harvard LpN
Joshua M. GreenbergNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/22/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-988 and 10-CV-1040 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
09/22/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (B)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/29/2010RECORD INDEX 10CV988
09/29/2010RECORD COPIES 10CV988 (ROOM 115A SHELF A2)
09/29/2010RECORD INDEX 10CV1040
09/29/2010RECORD COPIES 10CV1040 (ROOM 115A SHELF A2)
09/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/18/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R.13. (JAC) elp
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (opp) (elp)
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 7, 2011. (Castillo)
12/30/2010RECEIVED - motion to supp motion for ext of time to file brief filed 12/8/10.
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (opp) (elp)
01/13/2011APPELLEES OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief
01/21/2011 Upon consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that appellant has failed to seek consent of counsel for appellee prior to filing her motion pursuant to D.C. App. R. 27 (b), it is ORDERED that the motion for an extension of time is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant must follow the rules of this court regarding of her pro se status. See Macleod v. Georgetown Univer., 736 A.2d 977, 979-980 (D.C. 1999). (ETW) elp
03/08/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why APPEAL 10CV988 should not be dismissed AS MOOT, given that the appeal was taken from the denial of a motion for preliminary injunction... SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL FURTHER SHOW CAUSE, why APPEAL 10CV1040 should not be dismissed either as MOOT, See id; OR FOR LACK OF STANDING...SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW)
03/08/2011TMC - OTSC
04/28/2011 ORDERED that APPEAL 10CV988 IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPEAL 10CV1040 IS HEREBY DISMISSED since appellant lacks standing to appeal where she voluntary dismissed her claim in the Superior Court... (THKNTE)
04/28/2011DISMISSED
05/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED