judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STAP (ROBERT) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 36286
Short Caption:STAP (ROBERT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR4942Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10223
07/26/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-12956
07/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-12957
08/15/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 22, 2000. 00-14233
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14628
09/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16632
09/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 00-17162
10/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 13, 2000, appellant, Robert G. Stap, submitted a 'request to proceed pro se' and 'request for extension of time to file petition for rehearing.' We note that appellant is represented by counsel in this matter. We deny appellant's requests. We order the issuance of the remittitur stayed to provide appellant's counsel an opportunity to file a petition for rehearing on appellant's behalf. Appellant's counsel shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file a petition for rehearing, if any. If appellant's counsel does not file a petition for rehearing within 15 days of the date of this order, the remittitur shall issue 20 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. 00-18642
11/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19758
11/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Petition for Rehearing to attorney Cheri K. Emm.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2000. 00-19758
12/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 00-21431
12/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 13, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person request to recall the remittitur and for leave to file a late petition for rehearing. No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's request. Fn1[Although appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have received and considered appellant's request.] 00-22269