judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER A. DOOLITTLE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-86)
Case Number:06-86Case Docketed On:04/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER A. DOOLITTLE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER A. DOOLITTLE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher A. Doolittle Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/30/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/06/2006Motion - Consolidate appeals (05-177)MotionConsolidateFinal
06/20/2006Order - Denying motion to consolidate appealsOrderDenyFinal
07/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/29/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
09/19/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/11/2006Order - Consolidating cases (with 05-177)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
03/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter (no separate record requested for this appeal, trial court record already here with 05-177)Notice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal