judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KATHERINE T WALLACE V. ECKERT, SEAMANS, CHERIN & MELLOTT LLC

Case Information: 10-CV-0978
Short Caption:KATHERINE T WALLACE V. ECKERT, SEAMANS, CHERIN & MELLOTT LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5606-08Filed Date:08/04/2010

Opening Event Date:08/04/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:12/01/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/19/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/20/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKatherine T. Wallace NPro SeN
AppelleeEckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLCN
Edward J. Longosz, IINY
John T. MayYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August4, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
08/18/2010STATEMENT - of issues filed by aplt (whether the Superior Court erred in allowing appellee to re-file motion for summary judgment that had been previously denied as untimely) (elp)
08/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
08/25/2010RECORD INDEX
08/25/2010LETTER, from Appellee, designating additional parts of the transcript to be ordered. (*Appellee is requesting the transcript for the proceeding date of 5/14/10, to be ordered by the appellant) (elp)
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (10-pgs/tape 5/14/10 proc.)w/cd attached
09/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/20/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/01/2010APPENDIX
12/01/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/01/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/27/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/14/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
02/14/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/19/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/2011FiledARGUED before Washington,Reid,Wagner. Katherine T.Wallace Pro Se for appellant. John T.May Esq.,for appellee.
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) ( Chief Judge Washington, Reid and Wagner, Senior Judge)
11/28/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
12/31/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing.
02/20/2013FiledMandate