judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36281
Short Caption:GILL (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980764Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10115
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." Nos. 36280/36281/36282-cases are not consolidated. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 01-05024
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13691
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13691