judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL A. PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0136)
Case Number:S-07-0136Case Docketed On:06/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DANIEL A. PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL A. PENA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel A. PenaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/25/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
07/05/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed copy of waiver)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
07/06/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original notorized signature).Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal