Case: 05-13-00935-CV
05-13-00935-CV
07/02/2013
Miscellaneous/other civil
Michael Haller
Midway Collections/Nationwide Recovery Systems
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/23/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
05/19/2014 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
04/11/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/11/2014 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
03/21/2014 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
10/08/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/23/2013 | Letter filed | | |||||
08/16/2013 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||
08/15/2013 | Response due | | |||||
08/14/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/12/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/09/2013 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
08/02/2013 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
08/01/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||||
07/31/2013 | Record due | | |||||
07/18/2013 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
07/16/2013 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
07/09/2013 | Fee requested |
| |||||
07/02/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
07/02/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/02/2013 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
07/02/2013 | Fee requested |
| |||||
07/02/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
05/31/2013 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/11/2020 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
06/23/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Haller, Michael | Appellant | Craig K. Hemphill Michael Haller |
Midway Collections Inc./ Nationwide Recovery Systems | Appellee | Morgan Daniel Meyer |
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Scott J. Becker
219-05267-2011
Indu Bailey