Case: 05-92-01128-CR
05-92-01128-CR
05/15/1992
Possession of Cocaine
Lerma, Eliborio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/14/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/14/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/13/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/13/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/01/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
01/08/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
01/08/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
12/31/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/28/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
12/28/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/09/1992 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/12/1992 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/30/1992 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
08/14/1992 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/14/1992 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/07/1992 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
08/07/1992 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | | |
05/18/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/18/1992 | Transcript Tendered | | |
05/15/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/30/1991 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/11/1991 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F91-70738-TM
15 yrs TDC & $1,000 Fine