judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF JOSEPHINE BLAKE; EVELYN TURNER, APLT.

Case Information: 10-PR-0992
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF JOSEPHINE BLAKE; EVELYN TURNER, APLT.Classification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM1094-00Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEstate of Josephine BlakeNPro SeN
AppelleeLydia StewartN
Johnny M. HowardNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 6, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
09/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/15/07 & 5/28/10) (elp)
09/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND no oppo *Opposed (elp)
10/19/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for limited remand, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted to the extent that the appeal is hereby dismissed and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if not satisfied, appellant may file a new notice of appeal for the ensuing order of the trial court. (ETW) elp
10/19/2010DISMISSED
10/21/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived