Case: 02-18-00353-CR
02-18-00353-CR
08/09/2018
Appeal From a Pretrial Order
Kerry Jones
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/05/2018 | Mandate issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
08/30/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
08/29/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
08/20/2018 | Response filed |
| |||||||
08/09/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/05/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jones, Kerry | Criminal - Appellant | Stephen P. Wohr |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Catherine Luft |
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court
Denton
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling
F-2013-0580-D
Court Reporter, 362nd District Court