judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SAN JACINTO RIVER CONSERVATION AND RECLAMATION DISTRICT v. GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS

Case: A-355
A-355
10/30/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
SAN JACINTO RIVER CONSERVATION AND RECLAMATION DISTRICT
GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/10/1945Supplemental Brief filedRelator
12/04/1944Supplemental Brief filedRelator
11/27/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/26/1944Supplemental Brief filedRelator
11/22/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/08/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
11/08/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
10/30/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/10/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/08/1945Affidavit filed
12/04/1944Supplemental Brief filed
11/27/1944Supplemental Brief filed
11/26/1944Supplemental Brief filed
11/23/1944Letter Filed
11/22/1944Brief on the Merits
11/09/1944Affidavit filed
11/09/1944Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
11/08/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/08/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
10/30/1944Brief in Support of Petition
10/30/1944Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
10/30/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grover Sellers, Attorney General of TexasRespondent
San Jacinto River Conservation and Reclamation DistrictRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information