judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AZUBUIKE NWAOLU V. CHRISTIANA NWAOLU

Case Information: 10-FM-0991
Short Caption:AZUBUIKE NWAOLU V. CHRISTIANA NWAOLUClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1659-08Filed Date:08/05/2010

Opening Event Date:08/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:12/01/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/01/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAzubuike Nwaolu N
Robert E. CappellYY
AppelleeChristiana Nwaolu N
Chandra Walker HollowayYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 5, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
08/30/2010STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S)
08/31/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 3/26/10 4/30/10 3/25/10) (rt. ordered non appeal)
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (85 pgs/tape) 3/25/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (68 pgs/tape) 3/26/10 proc.
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (74 pgs/tape) 4/30/10 proc. cd attached
09/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
09/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (exhibits)
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/01/2010APPENDIX
12/01/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/01/2010APPENDIX - aple's
12/01/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (17 pgs/tape) 3/3/09 proc. w/cd
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/18/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
03/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (aplt)
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/07/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/07/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Glickman, blackburne-Rigsby and Farrell Robert E. Cappell, Esq. for the APPELLANT Chandra Walker Holloway, Esq. for the APPELLEE
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ)
02/28/2012FiledMotion to extend time to file a motion for rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
03/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing en banc to 4/2/12.
03/22/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
04/23/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc.
05/01/2012FiledMandate