judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIBBONS (WILLIAM) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34785
Short Caption:GIBBONS (WILLIAM) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 61955
Lower Court Case(s):Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 5045Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/29/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08418
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09568
10/29/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 9. Delivered by UPS 10/29/99. 99-10607
10/29/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-01998
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02086
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. 01-02086