judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAY X. VINCENS v. CONVENIENCE PLUS PARTNERS, LTD., a Colorado Partnership

Case Heading (S-07-0142)
Case Number:S-07-0142Case Docketed On:06/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JAY X. VINCENS v. CONVENIENCE PLUS PARTNERS, LTD., a Colorado Partnership
Full Title:JAY X. VINCENS, Appellant (Defendant), v. CONVENIENCE PLUS PARTNERS, LTD., a Colorado Partnership, Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJay X. Vincens Pro Se
AppelleeConvenience Plus Partners, LTD., a Colorado PartnershipJohn R. Hursh

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/20/2007Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee re untimely NOA. Will file motion to dismissEventPhone CallFinal
07/27/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/27/2007Memorandum - In support of motion, points and authoritiesMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
08/13/2007Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/15/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/21/2007Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal