Case: 03-11-00436-CV
03-11-00436-CV
07/08/2011
Administrative law
Granite Construction Company and J. D. Abrams, L.P.
Texas Department of Transportation
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/29/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
09/29/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/03/2013 | Exhibits picked up by appropriate attorney of record | | |||||
02/08/2013 | Mandate issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
11/20/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/27/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
09/06/2012 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
12/29/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
12/21/2011 | Oral argument denied | | |||||
11/29/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
10/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/11/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
09/29/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
08/29/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/26/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
07/28/2011 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
07/28/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
07/28/2011 | Telephone call received | | |||||
07/27/2011 | Notice of late record | | |||||
07/21/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
07/20/2011 | Document returned | | |||||
07/08/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
07/08/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
04/28/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/08/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/08/2019 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Granite Construction Company | Appellant | Mr. Troy L. Voelker |
J. D. Abrams, L.P. | Appellant | Mr. Troy L. Voelker |
Texaas Department of Transportation | Appellee | Mr. Matthew Bohuslav Ms. Anna Smith Spinks |
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
D-1-GN-10-002178