Case: 96-0850
96-0850
09/11/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
HAIDAR BARBOUTI HIGHLAND VILLAGE HOLDING INC. and P.O.R. INC.
THE HEARST CORPORATION and JERRY URBAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/12/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | envelope attached to original | |
12/11/1996 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/26/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/08/1997 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
04/03/1997 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | Justice Owen not sitting. | |
03/12/1997 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/12/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | envelope attached to original | | |
03/12/1997 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
02/21/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Justice Owen not sitting. | |
12/18/1996 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
12/11/1996 | Reply to Response | | | |
12/09/1996 | Notice from Counsel of a change in address | letter on behalf of White & Ogden | | |
11/26/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
09/12/1996 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | due 10-16-96 | | |
09/12/1996 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | app due 10-16-96 | |
09/11/1996 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/08/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 1C4 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BARBOUTI, HAIDAR | Petitioner | Mr. Steven J. Watkins Mr. David M. Gunn Mr. Thomas Herter |
HIGHLAND VILLAGE HOLDING, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. David M. Gunn |
P.O.R., INC. | Petitioner | Mr. David M. Gunn |
URBAN, JERRY | Respondent | Mr. Joel R. White |
THE HEARST CORPORATION | Respondent | Mr. William W. Ogden |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-94-00907-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
927 SW2d 037, 07-18-96
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
Honorable Hume Cofer
93-08036