Case: 13-0192
13-0192
03/18/2013
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
M.B. "BENNY" DANESHJOU, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE REPRESENTATIVE OF DANESHJOU COMPANY, INC.
ROBERT H. BATEMAN AND BATEMAN/PUGH, PLLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/2013 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of M.B. "Benny" Daneshjou, et al. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 9 D-1 | | |||||
09/06/2013 | Case Stored | Row 22 G-1 | | |||||
07/25/2013 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
06/07/2013 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
05/07/2013 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | To Mr. Alan Daughtry to request that they send in 2 courtesy copies of pet/rev efiled on 4/22/13. Left voice mail message. | | |||||
05/07/2013 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
04/30/2013 | Response Waiver filed | Respondents' Response Waiver. On behalf of Robert H. Bateman, et al. | ||||||
04/22/2013 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of M.B. "Benny" Daneshjou, et al. | ||||||
04/22/2013 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called attorney Mr. Alan Daughtry, left a message informing him that the motion for extension of time to file his petition for review has been granted. | | |||||
04/22/2013 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Daneshjou has been granted. Petition due April 22, 2013. |
| ||||
04/18/2013 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Second unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Daneshjou. |
| |||||
03/18/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due April 3, 2013. |
| ||||
03/18/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of M.B. "Benny" Daneshjou. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bateman, Robert H. | Respondent | Mr. David M. Gunn |
Daneshjou, M.B. "Benny" | Petitioner | Mr. Alan B. Daughtry |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-11-00804-CV
Affirmed
396 SW3d 112, 01-17-13
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Tracy K. Christopher
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
Honorable Michael Paul Gomez
2009-49701