judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARCIA (ROLAND) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36262
Short Caption:GARCIA (ROLAND) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C165651Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative Writ of Prohibition and Stay of Proceedings. 00-09880
06/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. Excerpt of Record, Volumes 1 and 2. 00-09881
06/13/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of the party beneficially interested . Due Date: 10 days
06/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition and the motion for a stay." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-10153
06/19/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 00-10444
06/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative Writ of Prohibition and Stay of Proceedings. 00-10596
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-11835
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/13/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[To the extent that this petition seeks this court's en banc reconsideration, the petition is denied as premature.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12054