judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL ANDREW BRISSON, JR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,

Case Heading (06-200)
Case Number:06-200Case Docketed On:08/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL ANDREW BRISSON, JR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,
Full Title:MICHAEL ANDREW BRISSON, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Andrew Brisson Jr.Kenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/04/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/04/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (Original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal