judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EDGAR SMITH v. TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY

Case: A-391
A-391
12/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
EDGAR SMITH
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/23/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/22/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
12/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/29/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1945Response to Motion filed
01/23/1945Response to Brief filed
01/22/1945Brief on the Merits
01/08/1945Bond
12/30/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1944Response to Petition
12/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edgar SmithPetitioner
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information