judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36263
Short Caption:MANN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A375705Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Wieczorek & Associates--check no. 3675.
06/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-09876
06/23/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writs of Mandamus and Prohibition. 00-10754
08/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. 00-14857
09/13/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Party in Interest Carol Baker. 00-16104
10/25/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. 00-18870
10/25/2000Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Dale Mann and American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company's Reply in Support of Writs of Mandamus and Prohibition. 00-18871
10/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file petitioners' reply, submitted provisionally on October 25, 2000. 00-18982
10/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Dale Mann and American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company's Reply in Support of Writs of Mandamus and Prohibition. 00-18871
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. On June 23, 2000, the real party in interest filed a motion to dismiss this petition. To the extent this court decides to address the merits of the petition, it will do so based upon the petition, answer, and reply filed with this court. We deny the motion to dismiss. 00-19500
02/08/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we grant American Hardware's petition for extraordinary relief and order the clerk of the court to issue a writ of mandamus." fn7[We have reviewed Baker's other arguments and conclude that they lack merit.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02533
02/08/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Nicholas M. Wieczorek for service upon Judge Mark R. Denton. 01-02538
02/26/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Denton on February 14, 2001. 01-02538
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-02568
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.