judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AARON BRADLEY JEREB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-242)
Case Number:06-242Case Docketed On:10/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:AARON BRADLEY JEREB v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AARON BRADLEY JEREB, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAaron Bradley JerebDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/08/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/09/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
04/19/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
04/20/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal