judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-383
A-383
11/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
COMMERCIAL CREDIT CORPORATION
GEORGE W. SMITH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/13/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1945Letter Filed
05/05/1945Response to Motion filed
04/26/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/25/1945Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed
04/25/1945Motion to Argue filed
01/13/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/05/1945Bond
12/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1944Response to Petition
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George W. SmithRespondent
Commercial Credit CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information