judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CANEPA VS. CANEPA

Case Information: 32125
Short Caption:CANEPA VS. CANEPACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV91230Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/16/1998 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Paul Gabriel Yohey-check no. 1116.
04/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-09829
04/16/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Judge Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/27/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/16/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Worrell re: status of pending cases (nos. 31714/32125/32734/32740/32756/32944/32975/32991/32992).
02/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended
04/20/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Settlement Judge Worrell re: status of pending cases (nos. 31714/32125/32734/32740/32756/32944/32975/32991/32992).
04/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction to entertain his appeal form the order denying his NRCP 52 (b) motion. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
07/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. We dismiss his appeal from the order denying the NRCP 52(b) motion. This matter will proceed as an appeal from the order sanctioning appellant for contempt. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Therafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). SNP99A-WM/DA/NB.
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 10, 1999.
12/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
12/20/1999BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 12/20/99.
12/20/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief.
12/21/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix received on December 20, 1999.
12/21/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief.
12/21/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
12/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Appendix to Opening Brief).
01/19/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 18, 2000.
02/18/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 2/28/00 - Reno/Carson Messenger.
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. " . . . we affirm that portion of the order finding appellant in contempt, as well as that portion of the order imposing sanctions with respect to the June payments . . . we reverse that portion of the order imposing sanctions with respect to the July through October payments, and remand for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13981
09/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14106
09/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2000. 00-14106