judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, et al.

Case Heading (06-236)
Case Number:06-236Case Docketed On:10/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, et al.
Full Title:BARBARA J. LASEN and PAUL S. LASEN, wife and husband, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. SAMUEL L. ANDERSON, Deceased; TRICIA L. ROHLOFF; and LEE C. ANDERSON, Appellees (Defendants), and FIRST NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE OF THE ANDERSON FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST NO. 1 DATED AUGUST 14, 1997, Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBarbara J. LasenJerry M. Smith
AppellantPaul S. LasenJerry M. Smith
AppelleeSamuel L. AndersonHoward P. Olsen Jr.
AppelleeTricia L. RohloffHoward P. Olsen Jr.
AppelleeLee C. AndersonHoward P. Olsen Jr.
AppelleeFirst National BankHoward P. Olsen Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/19/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/19/2006Memorandum - In support of motion to dismissMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
11/07/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
11/30/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal