Case: 08-15-00149-CV
08-15-00149-CV
04/23/2015
Malpractice
Tanyee Monique Johnson
Dr. Scott Harris, Dr. Peter Raphael, and Peter Raphael I, M.D., P.A.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/23/2015
05-15-00264-CV
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/2015 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
10/23/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
10/23/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
08/24/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/21/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||||
04/19/2017 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||||
03/29/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||||
01/13/2016 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||||
11/12/2015 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||||
10/23/2015 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||||
10/23/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||||
10/23/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||||
09/21/2015 | Record Sent | | |||||||||
09/18/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
09/18/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
09/18/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
09/17/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
09/17/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
09/17/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
08/24/2015 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||||
08/12/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
08/12/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
08/12/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
07/29/2015 | Letter received | | |||||||||
07/09/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
07/09/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
07/09/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
07/09/2015 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||||
06/17/2015 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||||
06/16/2015 | Response filed |
| |||||||||
06/15/2015 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||||
06/12/2015 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||||
04/27/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||||
04/27/2015 | Letter received | | |||||||||
04/23/2015 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||||||
03/16/2015 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||||
03/10/2015 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
03/06/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/21/2017 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Johnson, Tanyee Monique | Appellant | Hon. Norman J. Hoppenstein Hon. Amos Waranch Hon. Niles Illich |
Raphael, Peter | Appellee | Joel Jay Steed |
Harris, Scott | Appellee | Hon. Heather A. Kanny |
Peter Raphael I, M.D., P.A. | Appellee | Joel Jay Steed |
Trial Court Information
219th District Court
Collin
Honorable Scott J. Becker
219-00630-2013
Indu Bailey