Case: 01-96-01082-CR
01-96-01082-CR
09/03/1996
Aggravated Robbery
Wofford, Ashley Lane
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1997 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/11/1997 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
03/13/1997 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/13/1997 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
02/07/1997 | Motion to dismiss appeal | | |
01/09/1997 | Record past due | | |
12/13/1996 | Record due | | |
10/30/1996 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
09/03/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/26/1996 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
08/15/1996 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John F. Healey Jr. |
WOFFORD, ASHLEY LANE | Criminal - Appellant | Logene L. Foster |
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Brady G. Elliott
25840
5 Yrs. TDC