judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES A. TURNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0952
Short Caption:CHARLES A. TURNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-27868-08Filed Date:07/30/2010

Opening Event Date:07/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles A. Turner Y
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Michael Spekter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Michael Spekter, Esquire
09/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (56 pgs/Richer) 4/21/10 proc.
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (22 pgs/tape) 4/22/10 proc.
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (11 pgs/tape) 5/3/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8 pgs/tape) 5/11/10 proc.
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (24 pgs/tape) 5/26/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (15 pgs/tape) 7/22/10 proc. cd attached
11/09/2010RECORD INDEX
11/09/2010RECORD COPIES
11/09/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (order sealing bench conference-Judge Beck--filed 12/11/09)
11/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of November 17, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 3/25/11 no oppo
01/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 25, 2011. (JAC)
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 25, 2011 (unopposed)
04/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/25/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
12/08/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
12/30/2011FiledMandate